+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE
- Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
- Reports READ
- Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
- Taken from the table by the President
- On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 242 Yeas 23 - Nays 12 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497)
- in concurrence
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-497).
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-497) was READ and ADOPTED.
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
- Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 4, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph M
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 6-B
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 5 section 17852, sub-section 15
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph L
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph N
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 5 section 17852, sub-section 16
- Chapter null - 5 section 17851, sub-section 14
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 4, paragraph A
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 2
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 4, paragraph B
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph M
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 6-B
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17852, sub-section 15
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph L
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 1, paragraph N
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17852, sub-section 16
- Chapter 541 - 5 section 17851, sub-section 14
+ − Vote
June 10, 2019: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor