+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (40)
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
- The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington The Senate INSISTED To Minority OUGHT TO PASS Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-149) , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 154
- On motion of Representative FOWLE of Vassalboro, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 65 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-149)
- On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-149) READ and ADOPTED
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME
- READ ONCE
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 132 19 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
- Reports READ
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With REFERENCE to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety , in concurrence.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker laid before the House
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Bill was TABLED pending REFERENCE in concurrence.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on JUDICIARY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 7
June 3, 2015: ACCEPT MIN OTP RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16