+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (42)
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- ROLL CALL NO. 294
- Motion of Representative HIGGINS of Dover-Foxcroft to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- (Yeas 72 - Nays 72 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in concurrence.
- Taken from the table by the President
- Unfinished Business
- On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED From ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) READ and ADOPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 285 21 Yeas - 13 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-297) thereto ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION Unfinished Business
- RECONSIDER whereby the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161)
- The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) , in NON-CONCURRENCE
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
- Later today assigned.
- ROLL CALL NO. 232
- (Yeas 79 - Nays 59 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-161)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-161) READ and ADOPTED
- Taken from the table by the President ProTem Subsequently, On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 207 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 2 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED READ ONCE
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report
- Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to Accept the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report
- Reports READ
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Bill REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
- suggested and ordered printed
- Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2015: RECEDE AND CONCUR
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 72
- Absent: 7
June 17, 2015: ADOPT SAS-297 TO CAS-161
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 12, 2015: ACC MIN OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 13
June 11, 2015: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2