+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-36), in concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-36) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-36).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 2083, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 2083, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 2083, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 51 - 29-A section 2083, sub-section 2