+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-286), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-286).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 1, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On April 22, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On April 2, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 191 - 34-B section 15003, sub-section 10
- Chapter 191 - 34-B section 15003, sub-section 9