+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-903), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-903) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-903).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On April 1, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 14, 2022 in the joint:
- Voted - OTP-AM
- Work Session Held
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 4, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 17, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (13)
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11152
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11110, sub-section 1
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11109-A, sub-section 3, paragraph A
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11109-A, sub-section 2-A
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1-C
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1, paragraph F
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1, paragraph E
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1, paragraph D
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10953, sub-section 1, paragraph C
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10902, sub-section 6, paragraph F
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 10264, paragraph 2
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11701, paragraph 1
- Chapter 599 - 12 section 11403, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor