+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ ONCE.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-162) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-162), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-162).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835, sub-section 3
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835, sub-section 1
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter null - 17 section 1834, sub-section 4
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835, sub-section 5
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter null - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 5
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 3
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835, sub-section 3
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835, sub-section 1
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 1, paragraph A
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1834, sub-section 4
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835, sub-section 5
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 1, paragraph B
- Chapter 117 - 17 section 1835-A, sub-section 5