+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative BRYANT of Windham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-256).
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-256) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter 195 - 30-A section 741-A, paragraph 1
- Chapter 195 - 30-A section 747