+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 213 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 126
- (Yeas 77 - Nays 64 - Absent 10 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On June 2, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On April 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Reconsidered
On April 22, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - ONTP
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401.
- Received by the Clerk of the House on March 18, 2021.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 3, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 77
- Nays: 64
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor