+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-406) , in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-406) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED , in concurrence.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-406)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Woodsome of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
- Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 216 - 35-A section 2503, sub-section 1
- Chapter 216 - 35-A section 2503, sub-section 3
- Chapter 216 - 35-A section 2503, sub-section 21
+ − Sponsors (9)
DUNPHY
Type:
Primary Sponsor