+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- FINALLY PASSED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-563) in concurrence
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-563) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence
- Taken from the table by the President
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report in concurrence
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-563)
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
- Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor