+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (71)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the veto was sustained.
- 95 having voted in the affirmative and 52 in the negative, with 4 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
- Speaker laid before the House
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- ROLL CALL NO. 377V
- 97 having voted in the affirmative and 52 in the negative, with 2 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 378
- (Yeas 93 - Nays 56 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- On further motion of same Representative, TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. ROLL CALL NO. 379
- (Yeas 94 - Nays 55 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- Later today assigned.
- Speaker laid before the House
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- ROLL CALL NO. 390V
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. Later today assigned.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator HILL of York.
- On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
- PREVAILED
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 278
- (23 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- (Yeas 97 - Nays 51 - Absent 3 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 293
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, The House CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto.
- (Yeas 88 - Nays 61 - Absent 2 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 290
- On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, House Amendment "B" (H-439) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
- On further motion of same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-439) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) was READ. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative SANDERSON of Chelsea, the House RECEDED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION.
- Unfinished Business
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) READ.
- On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 166
- (21 -Yeas, 14 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- PREVAILED
- (23 -Yeas, 12 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec, Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) READ and ADOPTED. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- Roll Call Number 167
- PREVAILED
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-221) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence.
- Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 174
- (Yeas 89 - Nays 51 - Absent 11 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-286) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-286).
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, in concurrence.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
- Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
June 19, 2013: RECONSIDERATION - VETO
- Yeas: 95
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 4
June 19, 2013: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 52
- Absent: 2
June 19, 2013: RECONSIDER
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 2
June 19, 2013: TABLE UNTIL LATER
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 2
June 12, 2013: INDEF PP HBH-439 TO CAH-286
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 61
- Absent: 2
June 12, 2013: Enactment
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 3
June 6, 2013: ADOPT SAS-221 TO CAH-286
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
June 6, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
June 3, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 51
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor