+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
- (34 -Yeas, 1 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 133
- On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
- PREVAILED
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
- On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.
- Senator BOYLE of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, in concurrence.
- Reports READ.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Speaker laid before the House
- (Yeas 96 - Nays 48 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- ROLL CALL NO. 129
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned. (Roll Call Ordered)
- On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Representative WELSH of Rockport moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report.
- Reports READ.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed, in concurrence.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- On motion of Representative DILL of Old Town, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
- Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
May 23, 2013: Acc Maj Ought Not to Pass Rep
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 7