+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to COMMITTING the Bill and accompanying papers to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- On motion by Same Senator COMMITTED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, , in NON-CONCURRENCE.
- TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-111), in concurrence.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-111) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- PREVAILED
- (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent)
- Roll Call Number 75
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered)
- TAKEN from the Table by the President.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reports READ.
- On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence.
- (Unfinished Business)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-111).
- READ the Second Time.
- Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted.
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reports READ.
- On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 74
- (Yeas 92 - Nays 46 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-111) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Reports READ.
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
- On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- ROLL CALL NO. 74
- (Yeas 92 - Nays 46 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-111) was READ and ADOPTED.
- TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2013: ACCEPT MAJ OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 15
May 2, 2013: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 46
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor