+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Veto Overridden
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Engrossing Department.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 135 having voted in the affirmative and 11 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
- ROLL CALL NO. 528V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- LD 1030 In Senate, March 20, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 2 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-363).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-363)
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-363) READ and ADOPTED
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On August 2, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4320-K
- Chapter 340 - 24-A section 4320-K
+ − Votes (2)
March 22, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 135
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 5
March 20, 2018: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1