+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- 27 having voted in the affirmative and 114 in the negative, with 8 being absent, and 2 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained.
- ROLL CALL NO. 165V
- This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
- Speaker laid before the House
- (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast the Bill was TABLED pending RECONSIDERATION. Later today assigned.
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- LD 1025 In Senate, May 18, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 6 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
- COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned for SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- READ ONCE
- Report READ and ACCEPTED
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
- REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION
- Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed
+ − Votes (2)
May 25, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 114
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
May 18, 2017: Reconsideration - Veto
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6