+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On April 16, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
On April 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
- Under suspension of the rules
- CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-681)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-681) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-681), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
- Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor