+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
- On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
- Reports Read
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 194 Yeas 20 - Nays 14 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 72
- (Yeas 82 - Nays 62 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On May 27, 2021 in the joint:
- Reported Out - ONTP/OTP-AM
On April 26, 2021 in the joint:
- Voted - Divided Report
- Work Session Held
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT.
- Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- Chapter null - 37-B section 742, sub-section 1, paragraph F
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2021: ACCEPT MAJ ONTP RPT
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2021: ACC MAJ OUGHT NOT TO PASS REP
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 7