+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) thereto ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-612) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) READ and ADOPTED
- On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) was ADOPTED
- On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-863)
- On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment "A" (H-863) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
- Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
- READ ONCE.
- Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-863), in concurrence.
- Ordered sent down forthwith.
On March 31, 2022 in the House:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-863).
- Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
- CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
On March 28, 2022 in the joint:
- Reported Out - OTP-AM
On February 8, 2022 in the joint:
- Work Session Held
- Voted - OTP-AM
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302.
On June 3, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Approved
On May 21, 2021 in the joint:
- Carry Over Requested
On May 11, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On April 15, 2021 in the joint:
- Work Session Held - TABLED
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
- Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- Chapter 741 - 24-A section 4315, sub-section 9
- Chapter 741 - 24-A section 4315, sub-section 6
- Chapter 741 - 24-A section 4315, sub-section 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor