+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor (Emergency Measure)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-3) was READ and ADOPTED.
- Reports READ.
- ROLL CALL NO. 5
- (Yeas 140 - Nays 3 - Absent 5 - Excused 1 Vacant 2)
- The Bill was READ ONCE.
- On motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
- Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
- PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-3).
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-3)
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted
- Reports READ
- ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
- Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 19 Yeas 31 - Nays 0 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
- READ ONCE
- Committee Amendment "A" (S-3) READ and ADOPTED
On January 2, 2019 in the House:
- In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
On January 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2833-B
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4320
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2850, sub-section 2
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2849-B, sub-section 8
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4320-D
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4318
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2742-B
- Chapter null - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 11
- Chapter null - 24-A section 4233-B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2833-B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4320
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2850, sub-section 2
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2849-B, sub-section 8
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4320-D
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph D
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4318
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2742-B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 11
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4233-B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2849, sub-section 3-A
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2843, sub-section 5-A
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2850-B, sub-section 3
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph I
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4303, sub-section 4, paragraph E
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4234-A, sub-section 7
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4302, sub-section 1
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4234-A, sub-section 6
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2850-C, sub-section 3
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4319
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2849-B, sub-section 3-B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph B
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph F
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2749-C, sub-section 1
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4319-A
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4311, sub-section 1-A
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 2, paragraph C
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 4320-L
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2808-B, sub-section 2, paragraph H
- Chapter 5 - 24-A section 2736-C, sub-section 5
+ − Votes (2)
March 7, 2019: ACC MAJ OTP AS AMENDED REP
- Yeas: 140
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
February 28, 2019: ACCEPT OTP-A RPT
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor