+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ and PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Sentiment was PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, TABLED pending PASSAGE.
- READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative MOONEN of Portland REMOVED.
- SPECIAL SENTIMENT CALENDAR
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor