+ − Summary
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ and PASSED, in concurrence.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Sentiment was PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston, TABLED pending PASSAGE.
- READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative GOLDEN of Lewiston REMOVED.
- SPECIAL SENTIMENT CALENDAR