+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- READ and PASSED, in concurrence.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Sentiment was PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative FAY of Raymond, TABLED pending PASSAGE.
- READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative FAY of Raymond REMOVED.
- SPECIAL SENTIMENT CALENDAR