+ − Summary
+ − Actions (20)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ and PASSED, in concurrence.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Subsequently, the Sentiment was PASSED.
- Speaker laid before the House
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Unfinished Business
- Later today assigned.
- On motion of Representative TUELL of East Machias, TABLED pending PASSAGE.
- READ.
- On OBJECTION of Representative TUELL of East Machias REMOVED.
- SPECIAL SENTIMENT CALENDAR
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor