+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent down for concurrence
- Subsequently ADOPTED
- Taken from the table by the President
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Unfinished Business
- On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION
- READ
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
- Special Sentiment Calendar ADOPTED.