+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
June 2, 2015: Senate Vote on SCR 94, ADOPT (#640)
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor