+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor