+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SCR 88, ADOPT (#1014)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor