+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2018: House Vote on SCR 86, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1250)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 20
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 86, ADOPT (#645)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor