+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 23, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 82, ADOPT (#539)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor