+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/16/2016.
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 3/10/2016.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays.
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/08/2016.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported favorably (13-0).
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/07/2016.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 8, CONCUR (#122)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
March 8, 2016: House Vote on SCR 8, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#115)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
March 2, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#51)
- Yeas: 30
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor