+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2014.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and nays. Ordered sent to the House.
- Called from the Calendar.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 7, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 8, ADOPT (#769)
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor