+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 16, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 76, ADOPT (#417)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor