+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 81 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2016: House Vote on SCR 65, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#917)
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 23
April 28, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 65, ADOPT (#443)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor