+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
April 3, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 6, ADOPT (#236)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor