+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 2, 2017: Senate Vote on SCR 58, ADOPT (#173)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor