+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
March 10, 2020: Senate Vote on SCR 5, ADOPT (#13)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor