+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 66 yeas, 28 nays.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/2014.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-8).
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
May 14, 2014: House Vote on SCR 48, RETURN TO THE CALENDAR (#908)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 66
- Absent: 13
May 14, 2014: House Vote on SCR 48, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#909)
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 10
April 8, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 48, AMENDMENT # 2190 BY GALLOT, SCR 48 BY LONG (#322)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 5
April 8, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 48, ADOPT (#323)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 2
April 8, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 48, AMENDMENT # 2123 BY GALLOT, SCR 48 BY LONG (#321)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor