+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/21/2021.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 21 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 6, 2021: Senate Vote on SCR 48, ADOPT (#279)
- Yeas: 21
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor