+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor