+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 0 nays.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-0).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2018: House Vote on SCR 38, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#983)
- Yeas: 84
- Absent: 21
April 5, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 38, ADOPT (#276)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8