+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/17.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2017: House Vote on SCR 38, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#865)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
May 15, 2017: Senate Vote on SCR 38, ADOPT (#301)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor