+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
April 23, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 30, ADOPT (#133)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor