+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 87 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/18/2015.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2015: House Vote on SCR 29, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#374)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 18
April 22, 2015: Senate Vote on SCR 29, ADOPT (#85)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor