+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 8, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 28, ADOPT (#321)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor