+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 0 nays.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: House Vote on SCR 25, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#803)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
May 13, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 25, ADOPT (#333)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor