+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0).
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2020: Senate Vote on SCR 25, CONCUR (#690)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 29, 2020: House Vote on SCR 25, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#611)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
May 13, 2020: Senate Vote on SCR 25, ADOPT (#152)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor