+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
April 12, 2017: Senate Vote on SCR 23, ADOPT (#26)
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor