+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 89 yeas, 0 nays.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/07/2015.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- engrossed and sent to the House.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: Senate Vote on SCR 19, CONCUR (#1026)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
June 7, 2015: House Vote on SCR 19, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#823)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
April 28, 2015: Senate Vote on SCR 19, ADOPT (#128)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor