+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 4, 2020: Senate Vote on SCR 19, ADOPT (#46)
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor